MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation directs resources towards less advantaged individuals or organisations within a local catchment area of a 15 mile radius of the Building Society's branches in Melton Mowbray, Grantham & Oakham. The Foundation will commit at least 33% & up to 50% of its resources to kickstart a community project or to establish an enduring activity or initiative for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 12 January 1998: Standard registration
- MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN JOHN REASON | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Rachel Kolebuk | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Taylor | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Vicki Williamson | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT ANTHONY BROWNLOW | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MR DAVID WOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
KEITH HALLAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.95k | £20.20k | £8.31k | £12.40k | £22.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.90k | £28.93k | £21.76k | £23.97k | £52.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN OR WHO CONDUCT THE WHOLE OR PRINCIPAL PART OF THEIR ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF RUTLAND, LEICESTER, LINCOLN AND NOTTINGHAM
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF RUTLAND, LEICESTER, LINCOLN AND NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Melton Mowbray Bldg Soc
Mutual House
Leicester Road
MELTON MOWBRAY
LE13 0DB
- Phone:
- 01664414141
- Email:
- c.ritchie@mmbs.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window