THE ETCHELLS ASSOCIATION MEMBERSHIP (T.E.A.M.)

Charity Number: 1062668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

in school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £11,323
Total expenditure: £12,438

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 June 1997: Standard registration
  • 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 01 March 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T.E.A.M. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Gates Chair 01 April 2025
None on record
Alejandra Vicente Colmenares Trustee 03 June 2024
None on record
Omar leon Sanchez Trustee 03 June 2024
None on record
Kirsty Philippa Coveney-Winter Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.64k £229 £1.49k £10.00k £11.32k
Total expenditure £1.20k £4.62k £664 £3.23k £12.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2022 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ETCHELLS PRIMARY SCHOOL
EAST AVENUE
HEALD GREEN
CHEADLE
SK8 3DL
Phone:
0161 437 1792