Financial history THE SPENNYMOOR YOUTH THEATRE GROUP

Charity Number: 1061919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.82k £2.31k £15.02k £24.78k £24.84k
Total expenditure £12.70k £3.40k £11.89k £27.50k £20.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.20k