THE PARROT ZOO TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue, rehabilitate and offer long term sanctuary for parrots, parakeets and exotic animals. Provide educational facilities for the visiting public. Carry out beneficial research programs in areas that will benefit parrots and animals living in captive environments working with students from animal colleges and Universities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 1997: Standard registration
- 26 March 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 March 2018: Funds transferred to 1162135 THE PARROT ZOO TRUST
- PARROT LINE (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL PARROT SANCTUARY TRUST (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.22k | £176.09k | £357.05k | £191.82k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.07k | £62.07k | £355.13k | £121.25k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 February 2018 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 31 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 31 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 2007 AND 12 NOVEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF PARROTS AND OTHER EXOTIC BIRDS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS CONCERNING PARROTS AND SIMILAR EXOTIC BIRDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window