DEMESNE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Langley and their immediate environs by working together with inhabitants, Local Authorities and voluntary organisations in a common effect to advance education and to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreational and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 20 March 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Fraser | Chair | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Fraser | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Binns | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN MCCALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.58k | £218.74k | £231.09k | £174.36k | £178.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.35k | £209.40k | £227.18k | £190.39k | £173.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.50k | £22.00k | £24.44k | £12.00k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2022 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1997.
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LANGLEY IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE AND THEIR IMMEDIATE ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT)WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION ,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGEOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS FOR LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2)TO ESTABLISH ,OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "CENTRE")AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY)IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; 3)TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEMESNE COMMUNITY CENTRE
ASBY CLOSE
MIDDLETON
MANCHESTER
M24 4JF
- Phone:
- 0794095742
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window