Accounts and annual returns ASHMORE PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1061701
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 August 2024 569 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 August 2024 934 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 August 2024 1299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 August 2024 1299 days late Download Open in new window