PRESTATYN & MELIDEN COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YOUTH DROP IN CENTRE YOUTH CAFE AND INTERNET FACILITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
Governance
- 27 March 1997: Standard registration
- 30 November 2021: Funds received from 1075768 STARS GOGLEDD CYMRU / NORTH WALES LIMITED
- PRESTATYN POPIN CENTER (Working name)
- PRESTATYN MELIDEN COMMUNITY SAFETY GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERONICA WELLS | Chair |
|
||||||
Julie Pickman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE WALLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.66k | £165.26k | £131.71k | £167.27k | £29.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.02k | £112.36k | £157.14k | £138.61k | £93.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £14.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 19 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
1. TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING SERVICES 3. TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS
Area of benefit
PRESTATYN
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Rhyl Young Peoples Centre
17 Bedford Street
RHYL
Clwyd
LL18 1SY
- Phone:
- 01745357942
- Email:
- hello@popin.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window