SHIPSTON HOME NURSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal object is to provide home nursing and pallative care, without charge, to terminally ill patients in South Warwickshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 March 1997: Standard registration
- SHIPSTON HOME CARERS (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE JOHN ROBERT IRWIN | Chair | 22 April 2002 |
|
|||||
JOHN BEAUMONT | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
James Morgan | Trustee | 22 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
MARGARETHA PATRICIA SARGENT | Trustee | 07 April 1997 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 24TH JULY 2000.AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 21ST JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 28 MAY 2015
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM A TERMINAL ILLNESS (OR WHERE HOSPITAL ADMISSION WOULD NORMALLY BE REQUIRED) BY THE PROVISION OF NURSING CARE IN THE HOMES OF SUCH PERSONS 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF NURSES BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR SUCH NURSES IN THE CARE OF TERMINALLY ILL PERSONS 3. THE RELIEF OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND 3. THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE IN THE TOWNS OF SHIPSTON ON STOUR WELLESBOURNE AND KINETON AND IN OTHER PARISHES AND PLACES IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICTS OF STRATFORD ON AVON AND COTSWOLD AND CHERWELL
Area of benefit
THE TOWNS OF SHIPSTON ON STOUR WELLESBOURNE AND KINETON AND IN OTHER PARISHES AND PLACES IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICTS OF STRATFORD ON AVON AND COTSWOLD AND CHERWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 7B
Ground Floor Office
50 Stratford Road
Shipston on Stour
Warwickshire
CV36 4BA
- Phone:
- 01608 664850
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window