DARUS SALAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All general charitable activities, educate Islamic culture and religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 13 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Moj BASHIR | Chair | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ISIM ALI | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MIRZA NOOR | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
YOUSUF MOHAMMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUMAYUN KABIR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.59k | £94.78k | £117.94k | £183.76k | £154.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.60k | £161.52k | £65.67k | £80.06k | £80.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH, IN PARTICULAR OF SUNNI MUSLIM ADULTS AND CHILDREN B) FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF LEICESTER AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
LEICESTER AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Darus Salam Mosque
55-57 Upper Tichborne Street
LEICESTER
LE2 1GL
- Phone:
- 01162543887
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window