PILGRIM HOSPITAL SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness in Lincolnshire by assisting the provision of equipment for hospitals in the area, in particular, but not exclusively, the Pilgrim Hospital in Boston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 04 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Must | Chair | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Maria Henderson | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CLARKE | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Rivett | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.82k | £27.58k | £28.74k | £32.99k | £30.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.20k | £40.13k | £12.40k | £12.70k | £49.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 31 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN LINCOLNSHIRE BY: - ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT FOR NHS HOSPITALS IN THE AREA, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT FOR THE PILGRIM HOSPITAL AT SIBSEY ROAD, BOSTON, LINCOLNSHIRE. - SUPPORTING THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF STAFF AND PATIENTS AT NHS HOSPITALS IN THE AREA, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, STAFF AND PATIENTS AT THE PILGRIM HOSPITAL, SIBSEY ROAD, BOSTON, LINCOLNSHIRE.
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pilgrim Support Shop
6 Rosegarth Street
BOSTON
PE21 8QU
- Phone:
- 01205356396
- Email:
- dragonmick52@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window