TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE (NORTHAMPTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides meaningful volunteering opportunities for disabled volunteers, by providing workshop facilities, enabling volunteers to refurbish hand tools donated by the public. These are then donated to other charitable organisations working to relieve poverty within the UK and under-developed areas of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income includes £13,076 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 06 June 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARILYN ANNE ARNOLD | Chair | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
BECKIE GOODRIDGE | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARY DUNN | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAM KNOWLTON | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES KENNETH HAYES | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.27k | £81.53k | £87.53k | £70.05k | £75.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.51k | £74.51k | £73.53k | £75.61k | £75.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.73k | £12.50k | £12.50k | £11.00k | £13.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2012
Charitable objects
1)TO WORK WITH ADULTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE A PHYSICAL DISABILITY, LEARNING DISABILITY, MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEM OR WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE IN ORDER TO MAXIMISE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES REFURBISHING TOOLS FOR DONATION TO OTHER CHARITIES; 2)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN UNDERDEVELOPED OR DISEMPOWERED AREAS OF THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BY THE DONATION OF REFURBISHED TOOLS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE NORTHAMPTON
UNIT 4
STATION WORKS
STATION ROAD
LONG BUCKBY NORTHAMPTON
NN6 7PF
- Phone:
- 07855607363
- Email:
- TFSRNORTHAMPTON1@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window