THE FRIENDS OF BIRMINGHAM CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Birmingham Cathedral makes grants to Birmingham Cathedral to further its religious and other charitable work, and to assist and promote the restoration, maintenance, repair and improvement of the Cathedral.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 28 August 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Reverend Matthew Thompson | Chair | 30 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
The Reverend Canon Andrew Mark Delmege | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162 | £28 | £112 | £112 | £203 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2024 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED 6 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 24 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CATHEDRAL (2) TO ASSIST AND PROMOTE THE RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CATHEDRAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Philips Cathedral (C of E)
Colmore Row
Birmingham
B3 2QB
- Phone:
- 01212621840
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window