THE WHAT? CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young Person's Advice, Information and Counselling Service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £375,934 from 6 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
Governance
- 24 September 1997: Standard registration
- THE WHAT? CENTRE LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nadia Jane Billingham | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
MRS GILL LENO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEMMA MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £530.33k | £562.53k | £913.42k | £455.22k | £455.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £544.33k | £556.32k | £603.37k | £630.04k | £567.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £375.93k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.47k | £2.95k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £523.12k | £559.49k | £907.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £351 | £94 | £60 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £394 | £0 | £5.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.95k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £544.33k | £556.32k | £603.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.56k | £2.56k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL ILL HEALTH AND THE PROMOTION OF THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELL BEING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS; AND B) BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING AND ADVICE, INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 COVENTRY STREET
STOURBRIDGE
WEST MIDLANDS
DY8 1EP
- Phone:
- 01384379992
- Email:
- what.whatcentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window