KEIGHLEY KIDDICARE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide childcare for lone parents and other families in the Keighley area - day nursery, holiday playscheme and out of school clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £108,602 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 18 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Dlambulo | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Manley | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Widdop | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Manley | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Greenwood | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £370.33k | £307.07k | £254.76k | £270.46k | £252.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £406.05k | £312.06k | £351.14k | £309.44k | £298.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £202.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £228.52k | £116.28k | £114.08k | £108.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WHO ARE BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE OR WHO ARE OF COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND HOLIDAYS AND IN PARTICULAR SUCH FACILITIES ARE TO BE PROVIDED FOR THOSE CHILDREN OF LONE PARENT FAMILIES IN KEIGHLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
KEIGHLEY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Highfield Centre
21 Drewry Road
KEIGHLEY
West Yorkshire
BD21 2QG
- Phone:
- 01535664055
- Email:
- admin@kiddicare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window