Financial history NEWCASTLE ON CLUN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1064389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.97k £11.84k £5.93k £6.06k £9.81k
Total expenditure £5.82k £6.06k £10.76k £10.03k £12.46k
Income from government contracts £348 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.55k N/A N/A N/A