NEWCASTLE ON CLUN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newcastle Community Centre is the social centre of the village along with the local public house. We hold events such as dances, discos, concerts etc and the community uses it for weddings, funerals and other family events. We run various clubs and sporting activities and try to provide as many activities as we can for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 September 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JOHN MORRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kimberley Joy Davies | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Gittins | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Austin Cunning | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Jane Morris | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger James Hummerston | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA ELIZABETH LEWIS | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|||||
MR ROY REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.97k | £11.84k | £5.93k | £6.06k | £9.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £6.06k | £10.76k | £10.03k | £12.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £348 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF NEWCASTLE AND THE SURROUNDING PARISHES IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF NEWCASTLE AND THE SURROUNDING PARISHES IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILL ROAD
NEWCASTLE
CRAVEN ARMS
SHROPSHIRE
SY7 8QL
- Phone:
- 01588640168
- Email:
- mary@whitcott.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window