KNARESBOROUGH AND HARROGATE COMMUNITY SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Knaresborough and Harrogate Community Support Services exists to provide direct services and support for older people and their carers in order that they may remain living as independently as possible in their own homes and enjoying later life . This objective is carried out through the provision of health and social care services both in the community and at Chain Lane Community Anchor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,250 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 August 1997: Standard registration
- AGECONCERNCLIFFHOUSE (Working name)
- CLIFF HOUSE (Working name)
- AGE CONCERN KNARESBOROUGH (Previous name)
- AGE UK KNARESBOROUGH & DISTRICT (Previous name)
- AGE UK KNARESBOROUGH AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Cliff House Community Support Services (Previous name)
- HARROGATE & KNARESBOROUGH COMMUNITY SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miranda Armitage | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Archer | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Louis Coad | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Stephen Walton | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK ANTHONY LAWTON | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £412.50k | £345.54k | £279.72k | £301.61k | £371.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £482.21k | £345.42k | £329.13k | £390.43k | £421.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.07k | £69.31k | £25.25k | £25.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.25k | £59.88k | £40.00k | £25.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/03/2012 as amended on 22 Oct 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2018 as amended on 31 Oct 2024 as amended on 23 Dec 2024 as amended on 27 Dec 2024 as amended on 05 Mar 2025 as amended on 11 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
To promote the relief of frail and vulnerable adults and older people within North Yorkshire, especially the districts of Knaresborough, Harrogate and Ripon, in any manner which now or hereafter may be deemed by law to be charitable
Area of benefit
KNARESBOROUGH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chain Lane Community Hub
Chain Lane
KNARESBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
HG5 0AS
- Phone:
- 01423864956
- Email:
- info@chcss.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window