THE ALN VALLEY RAILWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the re-opening of the Alnmouth to Alnwick railway line and associated cycleway/footpath
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,108 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Proctor | Chair | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ann Ford | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Hurlbutt | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam John William Stone | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hayton | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Head | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Hogg | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Christopher Angus Freeman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.43k | £152.85k | £261.39k | £381.80k | £241.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.78k | £124.68k | £167.52k | £180.56k | £178.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £80.24k | £11.63k | £28.95k | £9.54k | £6.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 1997 as amended on 24 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESTORING, PRESERVING AND OPERATING RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, CARRIAGES, WAGONS, VEHICLES AND OTHER ARTIFACTS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST AND BUILDINGS CONNECTED THEREWITH AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO RESTORE THE RAIL LINK BETWEEN ALNWICK AND ALNMOUTH SO AS TO BRING THE HISTORIC TOWN OF ALNWICK INTO CONTACT WITH THE REST OF THE COUNTRY FOR THE BENEFIT AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE PRESERVING OF BOOKS, DRAWINGS, RECORDS, DOCUMENTS, SOUND AND VISUAL RECORDINGS, CINEMATOGRAPHY FILMS AND PHOTOGRAPHS RELATING TO SUCH ARTIFACTS AND VEHICLES, THEIR HISTORY AND THEIR DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Aln Valley Railway Trust
Lionheart Station
Lionheart Enterprise Park
ALNWICK
Northumberland
NE66 2EZ
- Phone:
- 07974040486
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window