ROOKS NEST PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Pre- school is to provide a warm, caring enviroment where children and parents are valued and respected. We provide activities to support and encourage individual learning goals as well as working closely with the main school and extended services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £46,160 from 12 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 08 December 1997: Standard registration
- 13 February 2023: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.39k | £79.37k | £66.69k | £60.26k | £77.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.19k | £74.93k | £65.38k | £73.79k | £68.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.25k | £44.75k | N/A | £46.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 04 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window