Accounts and annual returns SMETHWICK LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1062522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 October 2023 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 23 October 2022 06 August 2024 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 23 October 2021 06 August 2024 714 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 23 October 2020 06 August 2024 1079 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 23 October 2019 07 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 October 2019 Not Required