JUBILEE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (ANTIOCH CHRISTIAN MISSION) TRU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As well as church, the Charity operates Jubilee Church Life Centre for the community. This is used by many including those with learning difficulties, mental health issues, substance misuse and former offenders. People from other nations are given the oportunity to practice spoken English. A Craft Group, Youth and Childrens' Groups use the centre. The Life Centre provides educational oportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 March 1997: Standard registration
- 11 October 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1181444 JUBILEE CHURCH (ACM)
- JUBILEE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- JUBILEE FELLOWSHIP/JCF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.92k | £233.73k | £304.39k | £239.40k | £202.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.81k | £163.28k | £161.56k | £200.23k | £117.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.36k | £0 | N/A | £41.31k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 19 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 19 March 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY 3. OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window