Financial history JUDY CLARK CHILDCARE

Charity Number: 1065488
Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £152.30k £121.45k £130.98k £81.35k £113.03k
Total expenditure £148.32k £135.78k £116.61k £139.93k £132.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £96.64k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £14.78k £68.57k £85.86k