QUEEN ELIZABETH'S PTA
Charity Number: 1070510
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main function is to raise funds for School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Total income: £3,889
Total expenditure: £7,371
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Lincolnshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 July 1998: Standard registration
- 09 January 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 09 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1163654 QEHS FOUNDATION (GAINSBOROUGH)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- QES'PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.80k | £6.80k | £8.68k | £7.72k | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.86k | £4.57k | £15.16k | £2.80k | £7.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 17 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 17 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/01/1997 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window