Trustees BUCKINGHAMSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 310525

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doug Stuckey | Chair | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Rothwell | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Zeepvat | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Garry Marshall | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gray | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Harry Ball | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Julian Hunt | Trustee | 04 May 2015 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL EDWARD FARLEY | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Michael John Ghirelli | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN MARSDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.