FRIENDS OF SOWERBY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various fundraising events ie fairs etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 March 1997: Standard registration
- SOWERBY C.P. SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Rudd | Chair | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Joanne Shepley | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Busfield | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Follett | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Symmonds | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.16k | £3.42k | £5.79k | £3.12k | £7.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £3.05k | £6.26k | £5.45k | £5.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JAN 1997 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 APR 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sowerby Primary Academy
TOPCLIFFE ROAD
SOWERBY
THIRSK
YO7 1RX
- Phone:
- 01845523037
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window