BHAGWAN VALMIK TEMPLE (ASHRAM) AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE VALMIKI RELIGION THROUGH THE TEACHINGS OF BHAGWAN VALMIK JI AND THE MAHA RAMAYANA IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. TO ORGANISE PUBLIC MEETINGS TO PROPAGATE THE TEACHINGS OF BHAGWAN VALMIK JI AND TO CELEBRATE THE BIRTH AND MEMORIAL DAY OF BHAGWAN VALMIK JI. THE CREATION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE TO PROVIDE BENEFIT FOR THE CITIZENS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 31 July 2001: Standard registration
- BHAGWAN VALMIK SABHA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMARJIT RAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHARANJI LAL NAHAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RESHAM LAL SAHOTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOM NATH NAHAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £7.35k | £8.79k | £7.69k | £7.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £5.24k | £8.90k | £7.52k | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE VALMIKI RELIGION THROUGH THE TEACHINGS OF BHAGWAN VALMIK JI AND THE MAHA RAMAYANA IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO ORGANISE PUBLIC MEETINGS TO PROPAGATE THE TEACHINGS OF VALMIK JI AND TO CELEBRATE THE BIRTH AND MEMORIAL DAY OF BHAGWAN VALMIK JI. 3. THE CREATION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE TO PROVIDE BENEFIT FOR THE CITIZENS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
197 Goldthorn Hill
Penn
Wolverhampton
WV2 4QB
- Phone:
- 07787808739
- Email:
- valmikimandir@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window