Financial history LEEDS AND MOORTOWN FURNITURE STORE LIMITED

Charity number: 1061705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £238.28k £227.72k £211.67k £195.67k £170.39k
Total expenditure £252.03k £243.48k £232.65k £235.02k £252.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £128.71k £187.66k £125.48k £123.40k £71.98k