LEEDS AND MOORTOWN FURNITURE STORE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The distribution of donated furniture to socially & economically dis-advantaged people in a non-discriminatory way. To work in partnership with other statutory, charitable & voluntary agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £71,982 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 08 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth James Davies | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Olijnyk | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Rodney Russell | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stoodley | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Taylor | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.28k | £227.72k | £211.67k | £195.67k | £170.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.03k | £243.48k | £232.65k | £235.02k | £252.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £128.71k | £187.66k | £125.48k | £123.40k | £71.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 MARCH 1997, 2 DECEMBER 1998, 6 SEPTEMBER 1999, AND 18 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
1) RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE CLIENTS OF STATUTORY OR VOLUNTARY BODIES IN LEEDS AND SURROUNDING AREAS, THE WORK OF WHICH IS CONCERNED WITH THE RELIEF OF THE POOR, THE AGED, THE DISABLED OR THE INFIRM, OR OF SUCH OTHER PERSONS IN NEED, BY THE COLLECTION, STORAGE, RENOVATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF DONATED FURNITURE TO SUCH PERSONS OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2) THE PROMOTION, DIRECTLY, OF THE MORE EFFICIENT WORKINGS OF CHARITIES IN LEEDS AND TO RESEARCH, DEVELOP EDUCATION AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION TO ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC TO DONATE FURNITURE TO BE USED AS PER THE OBJECTS AND THEREBY DEVELOP THE USE OF MORE SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES
Area of benefit
LEEDS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT F
SEACROFT INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
COAL ROAD
LEEDS
LS14 2AQ
- Phone:
- 01132739727
- Email:
- info@leedsandmoortown.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window