CANNOCK CHASE ADVICE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre is in a deprived ex - mining area and that it helps in filling complicated forms and general help to the unemployed of the area. The Charity helps the population of Cannock Chase and the surrounding districts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £12,110 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 June 1997: Standard registration
- 20 January 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1209864 CANNOCK CHASE ADVICE CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.33k | £11.39k | £30.86k | £25.41k | £13.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.77k | £15.31k | £15.16k | £14.72k | £14.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.19k | £11.30k | £19.36k | £24.36k | £12.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED 29 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION FOR THOSE WHO ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES. B) TO ADVANCE OR ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF UNEMPLOYED PERSONS. C) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, BEING PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY OR THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE. D) ALSO THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF CANNOCK CHASE BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF CANNOCK CHASE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window