Financial history THE DENHAM PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS

Charity number: 310553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £549 £566 £577 £593 £594
Total expenditure £500 £550 £1.00k £350 £350
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A