Financial history ROGERS' EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 310557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.36k £200 £2.00k £1.25k £125
Total expenditure £2.55k £350 £1.70k £900 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A