CHALFONT ST GILES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of financial grants to boys and girls resident in the Parish of Chalfont St Giles for education and to assist them for entry into a profession, trade or calling.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £675
Total expenditure: £960

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ian Brown Chair 01 April 2014
None on record
Hannah Kate Tew Trustee 20 April 2019
None on record
Eileen Baldwin Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
GORDON PATRICK Trustee 01 April 2005
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £654 £624 £615 £637 £675
Total expenditure £630 £630 £0 £0 £960
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 November 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 November 2024 385 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 February 2021 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Claren
Nightingales Lane
Chalfont St. Giles
HP8 4SF
Phone:
01494872494
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available