SIR WILLIAM BORLASE'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to the State Education of students between 11 - 19 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 21 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Elizabeth Towell | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Oliver James Goodall | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Countess Elizabeth Howe | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr Gregory Lim | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Compton | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.10k | £105 | £41 | £9 | £34 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £18.48k | £0 | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 13 August 2024 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 April 2022 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/07/1996 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 17/12/2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FOR THE SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS AND THE TRUSTEES FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS
Area of benefit
MARLOW URBAN, GREAT MARLOW, LITTLE MARLOW AND MEDMENHAM.
Linked charities
- 21 November 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sir William Borlases Grammar School
West Street
MARLOW
Buckinghamshire
SL7 2BR
- Phone:
- 01628816500
- Email:
- enquiries@swbgs.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window