Trustees MALTMAN'S GREEN SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 310633

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nikki Singla | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Easterbrook | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Burton | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jolyon Austin | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Carson | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Honey | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Paynter | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Simmons BA | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID IAN SEGALL FCCA | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA BOND BSC MRICS | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.