ST MARYS SCHOOL GERRARD CROSS LIMITED

Charity number: 310634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Mary's School is a vibrant, academic and caring independent school for girls aged from 3 to 18 years. The school aims to provide a stimulating, well balanced education within a value system based on the beliefs and ethics of the Church of England, reflecting the Anglican Foundation of the School and as well as recognising and affirming the religious and cultural differences of all the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEREK ROBERT WILSON FCA Chair
None on record
Rory Cameron McCulloch Fisher Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Dr Sian Salek Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Devinder Bansi Trustee 19 March 2022
None on record
Stephanie Clifford Trustee 08 March 2021
None on record
Marina Hall Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
CHRISTINE BAYLISS Trustee 09 May 2011
None on record
DAVID CAMPKIN Trustee
None on record
NICHOLAS HALLCHURCH Trustee
None on record
NICHOLAS SIDNEY MOSS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.99m £5.57m £6.43m £7.17m £7.64m
Total expenditure £4.99m £5.30m £6.09m £7.12m £7.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £34.06k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.95m £5.57m £6.43m £7.13m £7.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.03k £120 £1.08k £33.27k £70.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.99m £5.30m £6.09m £7.12m £7.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £14.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.78k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £8.82m £8.67m £8.75m £8.98m £9.22m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.62m £2.04m £2.41m £2.36m £2.06m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£263.00k -£175.00k -£140.88k -£110.89k -£84.23k
Total liabilities £2.43m £2.44m £2.54m £2.71m £2.26m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 21 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 01 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 13 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MAY 1949
Charitable objects
ANNUAL PRIZE TO BE AWARDED EACH YEAR AT THE NOMINATION OF THE HEADMISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 12 December 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys School
92-94 Packhorse Road
Gerrards Cross
SL9 8JQ
Phone:
01753883370