ETON END SCHOOL TRUST (DATCHET) LIMITED

Charity number: 310644
Charity reporting is up to date (191 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The School Trust is incorporated as a Company Limited by guarantee and is a registered charity. The objects are set out in the Memorandum and Articles of Association and are stipulated to be both charitable and educational. Any surpluses are re-invested in the School. Currently the School accepts girls from the ages of 3+ to 11+ and boys from 3+ to 7+.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ETON END SCHOOL TRUST (DATCHET) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES LAWTHER FULLERTON CLARK Chair 14 June 2012
THE WINDSOR AND ETON SOCIETY INCORPORATING WINDSOR HERITAGE
Received: On time
Sandeep Mohan Trustee 20 October 2023
None on record
Emma Jane Leonora Martin Trustee 03 March 2022
None on record
JAMES WILLIAM FREDERIC STANFORTH Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
JOHN ALLAN BOOTHROYD Trustee 05 March 2013
None on record
NICOLA JANE BREWSTER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.59m £2.55m £2.80m £3.11m £2.88m
Total expenditure £2.46m £2.48m £2.71m £3.11m £3.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £176.88k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £86.21k £15.16k £8.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £10.58k £0 £13.08k £9.06k £14.49k
Income - Charitable activities £2.58m £2.46m £2.78m £3.10m £2.87m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £6.63k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.44m £2.46m £2.70m £3.08m £3.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.12k £25.51k £16.64k £25.29k £52.59k
Expenditure - Governance £31.56k £17.93k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £4.67m £4.59m £4.60m £4.55m £4.51m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £910.70k £1.12m £1.21m £1.25m £829.69k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.28m £1.34m £1.36m £1.34m £1.18m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 January 2025 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 07 January 2025 191 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 November 2023 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 November 2023 143 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
162B Chobham Road
ASCOT
Berkshire
SL5 0HU
Phone:
01344628993
Website:

No information available