DR BUCKERIDGE'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All funds used for the education and welfare of children at St Cedd's Primary School and for activities in accordance with the principals of the Church of England, like Sunday Schools or other such ways as seen fit by the managing trustees, in the area of benefit Bradwell-on-Sea.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 06 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Steven Poss | Chair | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM HIRON | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL PUDNEY | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID THORPE | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||
THERESA REED | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.34k | £16.30k | £15.83k | £12.70k | £16.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.21k | £19.26k | £14.14k | £5.20k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20TH JUNE 1861
Charitable objects
A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE POOREST BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE PARISH OF BRADWELL-JUXTA-MARE WHICH SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS SHALL CONSIST OF A BOYS' SCHOOL, A GIRLS' SCHOOL, AN INFANT SCHOOL, A SUNDAY SCHOOL AND IN ADDITION THERETO THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN EVENING SCHOOL FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF ADULTS AND YOUNG PERSONS NOT ABLE TO ATTEND THE DAY SCHOOL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRADWELL-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brambles
East End Road
Bradwell-On-Sea
SOUTHMINSTER
Essex
CM0 7PP
- Phone:
- 01621776588
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window