GESTINGTHORPE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Grants for educational purposes for mainly under 25 year olds within the ancient parish of Gestingthorpe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Essex
Governance
- 22 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHLEY COOPER | Chair |
|
||||||
Claire Craig | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corinna R Brown | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Padgett | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Beverley Vincent | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER NICE | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH TRICIA NOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALICE RUTH NOLDA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £1.77k | £1.95k | £1.90k | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £1.74k | £2.10k | £2.64k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 17 OCTOBER 1969 AND 22 MARCH 1972 as amended on 13 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(1) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES EXHIBITIONS OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION, APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES, TO BE AWARDED UNDER RULES TO BE MADE BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE EXHIBITIONS, AND THE QUALIFICATIONS, AND METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION, OF CANDIDATES (2) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO HELP BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ENTER, A PROFESSION, TRADE, OR CALLING (3) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF GESTINGTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pot Kilns, Pot Kiln Chase
Gestingthorpe
Halstead
Halstead
Essex
CO9 3AU
- Phone:
- 07491690510
- Email:
- jane@crumpton-taylor.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window