HART'S AND NASH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Involved with education and training. Makes grants to individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 24 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH MARSHALL | Chair |
|
||||||
Helen Rayner | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mowat | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS BOYLE FBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85k | £2.64k | £2.74k | £2.99k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | £5.32k | £0 | £6.84k | £3.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 3RD OCTOBER 1922 as amended on 24 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF GREAT CHESTERFORD SCHOOL. ASSISTING PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY; MAKING ARRANGEMENTS APOROVED BY THE LICAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING ANY PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA; OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDINGSOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES OF THE SAID PARISHES.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF GREAT CHESTERFORD AND LITTLE CHESTERFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tees
No 3 Journey Campus
Castle Park
Castle Street
Cambridge
CB3 0AY
- Phone:
- 01223702304
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window