ROBERT COLE'S
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Essex
Governance
- 21 June 1963: Standard registration
- 21 March 2006: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 3 MARCH 1732
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE AND BETTER SUPPORT OF A FIT PERSON LIVING WITHIN THE PARISH OF WILLINGALE DOE IN ORDER FOR HIM TO TEACH THE POOR CHILDREN OF THE SAID PARISH TO READ AND WRITE AND ALSO TO CATECHIZE THEM IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WILLINGALE DOE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window