HIGH EASTER EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting children of the village of High Easter via summer club and providing bible guides to children who attends the parish church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 11 January 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert David Stone | Chair | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Stockman | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
WILL O'CONNOR | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY BEALE | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN PARNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2020 | 02/04/2021 | 02/04/2022 | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £466 | £424 | £436 | £596 | £738 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.41k | £163 | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGH EASTER.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGH EASTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherry Cottage
The Street
High Easter
Chelmsford
CM1 4QS
- Phone:
- 01245230996
- Email:
- lucy757@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window