BISHOP GAUDEN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS TO ASSIST EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 23 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev roderick andrew montgomery reid | Chair | 05 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Charles Adams | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Joanna Mary Mallows | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £6.14k | £4.10k | £4.10k | £4.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55k | £6.20k | £4.30k | £3.92k | £4.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 1. BY MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS TO BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; AND 2. BY MAKING GRANTS, FOR THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO SCHOOLS OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, SERVING THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF BOCKING, STISTED AND BRAINTREE, IN ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 ACORN AVENUE
BRAINTREE
CM7 2LP
- Phone:
- 01376325925
- Email:
- roger.cooke7@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window