Trustees GREAT BURSTEAD EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Charity Number: 310836

Charity reporting is up to date (235 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES HUTT | Chair | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Smith | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Schrader | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Ann Jacob | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Nathan Sinclair | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Carswell | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH RICHARD WOOD | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BACCHUS | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MOORE | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.