WILLIAM PALMER COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 310860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

After maintaining its property, the Trust provides prizes and special benefits while promoting the education of the relevant beneficiaries who must be under the age of 25 years, in need of financial assistance and either residents of the Ancient Parish of Grays Thurrock or are attending or have for not less than two consecutive academic years at any time attended the school of the charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £249,278
Total expenditure: £108,262

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Thurrock

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1998: Standard registration
  • 01 April 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 01 April 2004: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PALMER'S TRUST (Working name)
  • WILLIAM PALMER TRUST (Working name)
  • WILLIAM PALMER SIXTH FORM COLLEGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN ROBERT LITTLE Chair
None on record
Denise Rimke Wakeling Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Ritchie Naylor Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Clifford Carter Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Clare White Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Fola Afelumo Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
Canon Eileen French Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
Nicola Hillebrandt Trustee 30 June 2014
None on record
MAUREEN CHALLIS Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GRAYS NORTH ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £235.40k £235.40k £236.70k £245.99k £249.28k
Total expenditure £172.49k £172.49k £210.80k £252.07k £108.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 17 October 2023 139 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 June 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 June 2021 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 15 October 2020 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 15 October 2020 137 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
(A) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; (B) IN PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS, TOOLS OR BOOKS, OR BY PAYMENT OF FEEDS, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (2) WITHIN THE LIMITS PRESCRIBED BY THIS SCHEME THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE FULL POWER TO MAKE RULES FOR THE AWARD OF EXHIBITIONS AND OTHER BENEFITS, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE AWARDS AND THE QUALIFICATIONS, METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION OF CANDIDATES FOR BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GRAYS THURROCK, ESSEX
Registration history
  • 02 June 1998 : Standard registration
  • 01 April 2004 : Removed
  • 01 April 2004 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
USP College
Palmer's Campus
Chadwell Road
Grays
Essex
RM17 5TD
Phone:
01375 370121
Website:

No information available