KING EDWARD VI'S SCHOOL AT CHELMSFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering the work of education at King Edward VI School, Chelmsford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 28 July 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JOHN LESLIE HUTCHINSON | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
Myra Merchant | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Teena Luxi Siriwardana | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Stephen Peter Foakes | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER JON WILLIS | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ROGER LESLIE BROOKER | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
IAN DONALD HOOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
ANDREW BOLESLAW SOSIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
WALTER HALL JP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
MR J F ALDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
GARY WILLIAM MILLER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
KENNETH GEORGE HESELTINE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
ALAN FREDERICK BALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.89k | £33.77k | £233.66k | £39.86k | £81.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.85k | £30.63k | £5.25k | £59.38k | £17.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 08/06/1966 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03/07/1967 AS AMENDED BY A MODIFICATION ORDER 29/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 11/03/1994 AS AMENDED BY A MODIFICATION ORDER 01/04/2011
Charitable objects
A SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS (INCLUDING AN ACADEMY) IN WHICH RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION SHALL BE GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.THE GOVERNORS MAY APPLY A YEARLY SUM OF NOT MORE THAN £500 IN PROVIDING SUCH BENEFITS OF ANY KIND FOR THE SCHOOL AS THEY DEEM APPROPRIATE BEING BENEFITS OF A KIND NOT ORDINARILY PROVIDED FROM GRANT PAID UNDER SECTION 79(1) OF THE EDUCATION REFORM ACT 1988. THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE GOVERNORS IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: A) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE GOVERNORS. B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO HELP BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, A UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ENTER, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. C) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD OR PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION. D) IN PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FROM GRANT PAID UNDER SECTION 79(1) OF THE EDUCATION REFORM ACT 1988, FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COACHING IN ATHLETICS, SPORTS, AND GAMES, FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RECEIVING PRIMARY, SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION; AND E) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS. (BENEFICIARIES MEANS PERSONS UNDER 25 WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR HAVE ATTENDED FOR A PERIOD OF 2 YEARS THE SCHOOL OR ARE RESIDENT IN CHELMSFORD AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE)
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CHELMSFORD OR RURAL DISTRICT OF CHELMSFORD.
Linked charities
- 28 July 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
King Edward Vi Grammar School
Broomfield Road
CHELMSFORD
CM1 3SX
- Phone:
- 01245353510
- Email:
- IBAINBRIDGEDYER@KEGS.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window