THE JOYCE FRANKLAND TRUST, NEWPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of land and property for educational use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 16 September 1966: Standard registration
- NEWPORT FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST - GENERAL FUND (Working name)
- NEWPORT FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST - NOREEN ALLEN BEQUEST (Working name)
- NEWPORT FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST - PRIZE FUND (Working name)
- NEWPORT FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- NEWPORT FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Richard Charles Gray | Chair | 24 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Nigel Poad | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Gareth Conduit | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GAILLARD | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA COLLINS | Trustee | 12 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £4.95k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.89k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28/01/1910 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/11/1921 ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT 06/09/1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/08/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/07/1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 11/01/2016 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL IN, OR NEAR, NEWPORT, IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE SCHOOL) FOR BOYS AND GIRLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 16 September 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Joyce Frankland Academy, Newport
Bury Water Lane
Newport
Saffron Walden
Essex
CB11 3TR
- Phone:
- 01799 540237
- Email:
- admin@jfan.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window