Trustees GOSFIELD SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 310871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Graves Trustee 07 October 2024
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF JOHN AND WILLIAM EDWARDS
Received: On time
ESTATE CHARITY OF JOHN AND WILLIAM EDWARDS
Received: On time
ROBERT EDWARDS (FOR EDUCATION)
Received: On time
ROBERT EDWARDS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF JOHN AND WILLIAM EDWARDS
Received: On time
Christopher Brown Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Deia Sakal Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Rick Cranfield Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
David Foster Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Daniel Sakal Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Katherine Makaroff Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Philip Davies Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Rex Smith Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Roderick Jackson Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Emma Larcombe Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Max Ford Trustee 09 May 2018
None on record
Jon Corrall Trustee 09 May 2018
None on record