Governing document ST NICHOLAS SCHOOL (HARLOW) LIMITED
Charity Number: 310876

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH APRIL 1962 AS AMENDED 20TH AUGUST 1965 AND 13TH NOVEMBER 2002 as amended on 02 Jul 2020 as amended on 25 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY CHARITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HARLOW
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.