THE CLARISSA CHUBB TRUST FUND IN CONNEXION WITH WALTHAMSTOW SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist Children/Young People in Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 25 June 1963: Standard registration
- THE CLARISSA CHUBB TRUST FUND IN CONNEXION WITH WALTHAMSTOW HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIANNA PHILIPPOU | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JAMES O'BRIEN | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN SHACKSON | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
KRISTINE HEIDI PRATT | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY MARRIOTT | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/07/2019 | 08/07/2020 | 08/07/2021 | 08/07/2022 | 08/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £502 | £512 | £522 | £535 | £543 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 July 2024 | Annual return not yet received | ||
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 11TH APRIL 1961.
Charitable objects
TO HELP TO ENABLE SENIOR SCHOLARS OF THE WALTHAMSTOW HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS TO OBTAIN EACY YEAR A HOLIDAY IN GERMANY, PARTICULARLY IN BAVARIA.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
WALTHAMSTOW SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
CHURCH HILL
LONDON
E17 9RZ
- Phone:
- 02085099446
- Email:
- info@wsfg.waltham.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window