BUSHEY, ASHFIELD SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity works for the education of children and adults "of the labouring, manufacturing and other poorer classes" in Bushey, Herts and its environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 May 1963: Standard registration
- 22 January 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1169602 ASHFIELD EDUCATIONAL FUND (BUSHEY)
- TRUSTEES OF ASHFIELD SCHOOL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.54k | £389.51k | £398.00k | £231 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.85k | £9.03k | £67 | £397.14k | £16 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 18 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 01 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 04 June 2017 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 04 June 2017 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 02 June 2016 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 18 July 2016 | 48 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21ST OCTOBER 1898, AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 9TH OCTOBER 1950
Charitable objects
SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS OR CHILDREN ONLY OF THE LABOURING, MANUFACTURING AND OTHER POORER CLASSES IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
BUSHEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window